Gordon v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Gordon
Defendant: Metroplitan Life Insurance Company and Borland Software Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv05399
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Under FRCP 52; Granting Defendant's Motion for Judgment Under FRCP 52. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Defendant's motion for summary judgment. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/07/2017. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) Modified on 9/7/2017 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Adjudication. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER STAYING CASE; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The conference scheduled for 12/14/2012 is VACATED. This case is STAYED until a final ruling has been issued on Plaintiffs anticipated appeal of the benefits determination. Due to what may be a period of extended inactivity while the appeal progresses, the clerk of the court shall administratively close this file. The parties shall provide notice to the court within one week of the issuance of the final appellate determination. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/12/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER STAYING ACTION; CONTINUING MOTION HEARING AND VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. This case is again STAYED until completion of the remand or until 7/31/2012, whichever occurs first. The hearing on 26 Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fee s on Remand is CONTINUED to 8/10/2012 at 9:00 a.m. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. The court instead schedules a Case Management Conference for 8/10/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 8/3/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/25/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Borland Software Corporation. Borland Software Corporation (a corporation) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/11/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gordon
Represented By: Charles J. Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metroplitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borland Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?