Scott-Codiga v. County of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Georgine Scott-Codiga
Defendant: County of Monterey, Monterey Sheriff's Department, Mike Kanalakis, Jerry Teeter and Victor Lurz
Case Number: 5:2010cv05450
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re: Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/1/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Continuing Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/22/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order Referring Case to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/7/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE. Jury Trial set for 11/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/22/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint re 23 . Signed by Judge Koh on 5/20/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ORDER re 21 Case Management Conference - Initial (with Judge's signature),, Set Hearings,. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/18/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Regarding Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/16/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Setting Deadline To Consent or To Request Reassignment. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott-Codiga v. County of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgine Scott-Codiga
Represented By: Adam Cabral Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kanalakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Teeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Lurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?