DSM Dyneema v. BAE Systems Tensylon H.P. Material, Inc.
Plaintiff: DSM Dyneema
Defendant: BAE Systems Tensylon H.P. Material, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv05466
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting re 30 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. ***All Hearings/Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 14 Stipulation. Deadline for ADR session 9/1/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/20/2011. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 23 Stipulation filed by DSM Dyneema. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2011. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila.(ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSM Dyneema v. BAE Systems Tensylon H.P. Material, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSM Dyneema
Represented By: Karin A. Kramer
Represented By: David Leon Bilsker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems Tensylon H.P. Material, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?