Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG v. Valley Corp. B. et al
Plaintiff: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG
Defendant: Valley Corp. B., Ty Levine and Karen Levine
Case Number: 5:2010cv05533
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 381 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/26/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 AMENDED ORDER re 364 Order on Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 364 Order on Stipulation.Motion due by 6/24/2014. Response due by 7/18/2014. Reply due by 8/1/2014. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER denying 360 Request to Reschedule Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/10/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Judgment having been entered in this case, the court finds a further case management conference unnecessary and hereby VACATES the conference set for 5/30/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/27/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The above-entitled case is again referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for a settlement conference to occur preferably within the next 30 days, but no later than 60 day s from the date this order is filed. Counsel shall contact Judge Corley's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date and time for the conference no later than March 24, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/19/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 28, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1871(b)(2), petit jurors required to attend more than ten (10) days in hearing one case may be paid, in the discretion of the trial judge, an additional fee, not exceeding $10.00 more than the $40.00 attendance fee, for each day in excess of ten (10) days on which the juror is required to hear such case. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that each member of the jury hearing the above case shall receive a total attendance fee of $50.00 per day for each day of service in excess of ten (10) days. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/29/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER Re Selection of Method of Presentation for Rescission Cause of Action signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 19, 2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER re: Pretrial Materials signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on November 1, 2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 PRETRIAL ORDER. Bench Trial Scheduling: Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine, and Exchange of Exhibits due 8/23/2013. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due 8/30/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2013 11:00 AM. Bench Trial set for 9/17/2013, 9/18/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial Scheduling: Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due 10/4/2013. Voir Dire Questions, Propose d Jury Instructions, and proposed Jury Verdict Forms due 10/8/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2013 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 11/12/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2013, 11/13/2013, 11/14/2013, 11/15/2013, 11/18/2013, 11/19/2013, 11/20/2013, 11/21/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Deliberations set for 11/22/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/12/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying Defendant Ronald J. Haas' 178 Motion for Leave to Amend Responses to Requests for Admissions. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. UpdatedPreliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 7/2/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***5/10/2013 PTC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying 128 Motion for Summary Judgment. The status conference set for 5/10/2013 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby converted to a Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The parties shall submit a Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement no later than 4/30/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/9/2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/9/2013 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting 170 Stipulation (1) Referring the Matter to a Settlement Judge (2) Continuing the Hearing on Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter (3) Keeping Probuilders Pending Motion for Summary Judgment Under Submission Until the Completion of the Settlement Conference. Pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for a settlement conference to occur no later than April 30, 2013.The court schedules this case for a Stat us Conference on May 10, 2013, at 10:00a.m. On or before May 3, 2013, the parties shall file a Joint Status ConferenceStatement which provides, inter alia, an update on the status of the case and the need to reschedule any case deadlines. The hearing on the Motion for De Novo Review of Magistrate's Recommendation is VACATED and will be rescheduled at the Status Conference if necessary. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER denying 123 Motion for Disclosure; granting 150 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/12. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 DISCOVERY ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd ON 119 Discovery Letter Brief 6; 120 Discovery Letter Brief 7; and 121 Discovery Letter Brief 8. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AMENDING ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT R. J. HAAS. The court expects the sanctions to be paid within a reasonable time, meaning within thirty days of the original order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/25/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Granting 104 Motion for Sanctions. Sanctions in the amount of $9,267.00 are awarded in favor of Probuilders and against R. J. Haas. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORTS 1-5 93 , 92 , 87 , 89 , 94 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING 101 Dismissal as to Ronald J. Haas' Third Party Complaint Against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London (an underwriting syndicate) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Modified Scheduling Deadlines re 90 Stipulation. Last Day to Complete Alternative Dispute Resolution by 3/27/2012. Close of Discovery 6/20/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference due by 7/31/2012. P reliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continue the Deadline to Complete Alternative Dispute Resolution re 85 Stipulation. Deadline to complete ADR 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Withdraw as Counsel as to Defendant Robert J. Haas re re 83 Stipulation. Attorney Chip B. Cox and Robert Lee Sallander, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION RE JUDGMENT re 80 Stipulation. Tatsuko Adachi terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Scheduling Order deadlines re 72 Stipulation. Close of All Discovery 4/20/2012. Last Day for Hearing Dispositive Motions by 6/22/2012. Pretrial Conference statement due 6/1/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Ronald J Haas and Extending Scheduling Deadlines re 69 Stipulation. Ronald J Haas shall file to file Third Amended Complaint within 5 days of the date of Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REFERRING CASE to re 62 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Extending Expert Discovery Related Deadlines and Scheduling Order Deadlines re 56 Stipulation. Deadline to file referral to Court's ADR program on or before August 31, 2011. Joint Pretrial Confere nce Statement due by 10/25/2011. Close of All Discovery due by 11/18/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions by 2/10/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TY LEVINE AND DEFENDANT KAREN LEVINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 28 Stipulation. Response due 2/7/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/31/11. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TY LEVINE AND DEFENDANT KAREN LEVINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTre 17 Stipulation. Response due 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG v. Valley Corp. B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG
Represented By: Aslan Bananzadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Corp. B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?