Kimball v. BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jim B Kimball
Defendant: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Case Number: 5:2010cv05670
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why the Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2011. The June 16, 2011 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference are VACATED. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/10/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Koh denying 3 Ex Parte Application for a TRO. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Court Judge. See 3 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jim B Kimball. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/4/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimball v. BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim B Kimball
Represented By: Quynh Nhu Trinh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?