Rivers et al v. PAR Pharmaceutical Companies Inc et al
Plaintiff: LaShawn Rivers, Adrian Rivers and Khyam Brown
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Companies Inc and LaRue Rivers
Case Number: 5:2010cv05677
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal without Prejudice re 47 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. ***All Deadlines/Hearings terminated. Finding as MOOT 45 Stipulation filed by PAR Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/3/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Relating to Deadlines for Initial Disclosures, Reports and ADR and Setting Case Management Conference re 38 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending Motion, the Court finds the Conference premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the March 14 Conference. The Court will set a new conference date in its Order addressing the Motion for Leave. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Relating to Deadlines for Initial Disclosures, Reports and ADR re 17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers et al v. PAR Pharmaceutical Companies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaShawn Rivers
Represented By: Matthew R. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Rivers
Represented By: Matthew R. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khyam Brown
Represented By: Matthew R. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Companies Inc
Represented By: Thomas Michael Frieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaRue Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?