Evans v. H.K.N., IV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Janice Evans
Defendant: Denny's, Inc., H.K.N., IV, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Thrifty Payless, Inc, Lion Capitol Investments, LLC, MMJ MacDonald, Inc, Kumar Management Corporation and BM5, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv05752
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT DENNY'S, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 68 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT DENNY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 75 Proposed Order, filed by Janice Evans. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 9, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISSOLVING JULY 29, 2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 61 Order to Show Cause Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 5, 2011. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2011. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO MEET AND CONFER re 55 Stipulation filed by BM5, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 38 Stipulation filed by Janice Evans. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. H.K.N., IV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.K.N., IV, LLC
Represented By: Daniel James Nevis
Represented By: David Irwin Kornbluh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Wayne Clinton Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless, Inc
Represented By: Wayne Clinton Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Capitol Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMJ MacDonald, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kumar Management Corporation
Represented By: Rissa Ann Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BM5, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Eileen Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Evans
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Levinson Moore
Represented By: Kenneth Randolph Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?