Third Degree Films, Inc v. Does 1-2010

Plaintiff: Third Degree Films, Inc
Defendant: Does 1-2010
Case Number: 5:2010cv05862
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The court orders this case DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/12/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 22, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2011. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why it has failed to: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on the remaining defendant to comply with Rule 4(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and (2) accomplish service of the Summons and Complaint on the remaining defendant within 120 days of filing the complaint to comply with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 10, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DOES 2-2010 WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and dropped from the action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 ***the complaint in this case is materially identical to the complaint in case no. 5:10-CV-5865-PSG.*** Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/10/11. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011) Modified on 11/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 request by DOE 137 for one-week extension of time time file motion to quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/4/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 6, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 41 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) Dismissal With Prejudice of Specific Doe Defendant(s), Namely Doe(s) 135, 166, 383, 384, 385, 604, 712, 762, 879, 964, 1048, 1250, 1282, 1292, 1303, 1347, 1369, 1673, 1690, 1716 filed by Third Degree Films, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
August 30, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Request for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/30/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Sealing Document. 35 Letter from Doe Defendant IP address 97.112.130.10 Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/29/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) Modified on 8/29/2011 (cvS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 7 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/29/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 22, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed. Plaintiff to appear for Show Cause Hearing set for 3/29/2011 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/22/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Third Degree Films, Inc v. Does 1-2010
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Third Degree Films, Inc
Represented By: Ira M. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-2010
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?