Leader Technologies, Inc., v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Leader Technologies, Inc.,
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010mc80028
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2010 ***MOTION HEARING Deadlines terminated (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW AND TO EXPAND THE RECORD; SUSTAINING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 30 Motion (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 69 Reply Memorandum re 30 MOTION for De Novo Review and to Expand The Record filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan re 67 Memorandum in Opposition, Confidential Documents Filed Under Seal (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 71 EXHIBITS 2 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 70 EXHIBITS 1 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 2 (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 1 (submitted) under seal *** please note counsel has not filed an Administrative Motion to file documents under seal ***. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate's Order filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING), # 2 Exhibit 2 (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING), # 3 Exhibit 3 51 Order filed on 4/9/10 granting documents under seal)(Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2010 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 49 Declaration in Support, 48 Reply Memorandum (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 52 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 2, 2010, before Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peter Torreano, Telephone number (408) 379-0900. Tape Number: 10:04:45-10:23:28. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2010. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 50 Proposed Order re 46 MOTION to Seal Document Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate's Order, Exhibit B to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes and Exhibit D to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 59 EXHIBITS B (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 58 RESPONSE to (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Received Document response (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Received Document Exhibit (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 49 Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of 48 Reply Memorandum Response to Leader Technologies, INc.'s Objectons to Magistrate's Order filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 48 ) (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 48 Reply Memorandum Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate's Order filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 47 Declaration in Support of 46 MOTION to Seal Document Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate's Order, Exhibit B to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes and Exhibit D to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION to Seal Response to Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Objections to Magistrate's Order, Exhibit B to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes and Exhibit D to Supporting Declaration of Melissa Keyes filed by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2010 Filing 45 Proposed Order re 43 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion for De Novo Review and to Expand the Record by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 44 Declaration of Sean M. Boyle in Support of 43 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion for De Novo Review and to Expand the Record filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion for De Novo Review and to Expand the Record filed by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 19, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 30 MOTION for De Novo Review. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 36 Renotice Motion hearing Amended Notice of Motion re: 30 Motion for De Novo Review and to Expand the Record filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Boyle, Sean) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified text to create linkage on 3/25/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Thomas Norberg (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 57 EXHIBITS 4 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 56 EXHIBITS 3 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 55 EXHIBITS 2 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 54 EXHIBITS 1 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 53 OBJECTIONS to (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 42 EXHIBIT 4 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 41 EXHIBIT 3 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 40 EXHIBIT 2 (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 39 EXHIBIT 1 (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 38 OBJECTIONS to (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION to Seal Document Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 33 Declaration of Sean Boyle in Support of 32 MOTION to Seal Document Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1,2,3 and 4 to the declaration of Sean Boyle in support of Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for De Novo review, and Objections to Magistrate's Order filed by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to re 23 Order on Motion to Quash by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for De Novo Review and to Expand The Record filed by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Filing 29 EXHIBITS 1,2,3,4 re 27 Declaration in Support, of Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for De Novo Review and To Expand The Record (EXHIBITS 1 - 4) (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) filed by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. (Related document(s) 27 ) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leader Technologies, Inc., re Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, 27 Declaration in Support, Received Document, Received Document Proof of Service (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of Sean Boyle in Support of Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document Declaration of Sean Boyle in Support of Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for de novo Review and to Expand The Record filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Related document(s)[], [], [], [], []) (Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 1 (submitted) under seal. *** Please note counsel not in conformance with Civil L.R. 7-11 (counsel has not e-filed administrative motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 2 (submitted) under seal. *** Please note counsel not in conformance with Civil L.R. 7-11 (counsel has not e-filed administrative motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 4 (submitted) under seal. *** Please note counsel not in conformance with Civil L.R. 7-11 (counsel has not e-filed administrative motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Received Document objections (submitted) under seal. *** Please note counsel not in conformance with Civil L.R. 7-11 (counsel has not e-filed administrative motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 3 (submitted) under seal. *** Please note counsel not in conformance with Civil L.R. 7-11 (counsel has not e-filed administrative motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/16/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 Filing 26 Declaration of Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan in Support of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena, pursuant to Court Order dated 3/2/2010 filed byThyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 25 Declaration of Stephen Dawson-Haggerty in Support of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena, pursuant to Court Order dated 3/2/2010 filed byStephen Dawson-Haggerty. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 24 Declaration of Karel Baloun in Support of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena, pursuant to Court Order dated 3/2/10 filed byKarel Baloun. (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 1 Facebook's and Nonparties' Motion to Quash and for Protective Order. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2010 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 3/2/2010) re 1 (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 14 Facebook's and Nonparties' Motion to Seal. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 21 EXHIBITS 1 and 2 (UNDER SEAL). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 19 Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of 16 Reply Memorandum Motion to Quash Deposition and Subpoenas Correction of Docket No. 17 filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan re 14 MOTION 16 Reply Memorandum (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 17 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 19 . *** Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of 16 Reply Memorandum Re Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas and for Protective Order filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 16 Reply Memorandum re 1 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas and for Protective Order filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 15 Declaration of Melissa H. Keyes in Support of 14 MOTION filed by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 14 ) (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal deposition transcript of Dustin Moskovitz, and Adam D'Angelo filed by Non-Parties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/28/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 1 (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Received Document Exhibit 2 (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 8 Leader Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time. Hearing re 1 Facebook's motion to quash set for 3/2/2010, 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. Facebook's reply due by noon on 2/22/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing re 1 set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Nonparties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty and Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan and for Protective Order and Request for a Contempt Order filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Andre, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Nonparties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty and Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan and for Protective Order and Request for a Contempt Order filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 10 Proposed Order re 8 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Non-Parties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty and Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan and For Protective Order under Civil L.R. 6-3, 9 Declaration in Support, by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 9 Declaration of Paul J. Andre in Support of 8 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Non-Parties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty and Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan and For Protective Order under Civil L.R. 6-3 filed byLeader Technologies, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Non-Parties Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty and Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan and For Protective Order under Civil L.R. 6-3 filed by Leader Technologies, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Andre, Paul) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Facebook, Inc., Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan re 6 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing (Keyes, Melissa) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing re 1 set for 4/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 8, 2010 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 4, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan re 2 Declaration in Support, 3 Declaration in Support, 4 Proposed Order, 1 MOTION to Quash (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 4 Proposed Order re 1 MOTION to Quash by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 3 Declaration of M. H. Keyes in Support of 1 MOTION to Quash filed by Karel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2010: # 1 Exhibit A) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2010: # 2 Exhibit) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 2 Declaration of J. Farren in Support of 1 MOTION to Quash filed byKarel Baloun, Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (Related document(s) 1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Deposition Subpoenas of Non-Parties. (Filing fee $39.00 receipt number 54611006778). Filed by Non-Parties Stephen Dawson-Haggerty, Karel Baloun, Thyagaraja S. Ramakrishnan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leader Technologies, Inc., v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leader Technologies, Inc.,
Represented By: Philip A. Rovner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?