In Re Beluga Shipping Gmbh & Co. KD "Beluga Fantastic" v. Suzlon Energy Ltd., Federal Court Proceedings, NSD 1670 of 2008 before the Federal Court, New Sourth Wales, Australia
Petitioner: Suzlon Energy Ltd, Suzlon Energy Australia Pty Ltd., Suzlon Infrastructure Limited, Suzlon Wind Energy Corporation, USA, Suzlon Structures Pte., Ltd. and SE Shipping Pte., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2010mc80034
Filed: February 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART SUZLON'S PETITION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY; ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY GOOGLE, INC.'S MOTION TO INTERVENE re 19 Brief filed by Suzlon Energy Ltd. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 23, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF RE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY re 26 MOTION for Administrative Relief Regarding Supplemental Authority Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Supplemental Authority; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Google Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 8, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INTERIM ORDER SOLICITING FURTHER BRIEFING REGARDING SUZLON'S PETITION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 USC SECTION 1782. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on April 12, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING SUZLON'S AMENDED ORDER FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 USC SECTION 1782. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 1, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE SUZLON'S PETITION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY IN AID OF FOREIGN JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 USC SECTION 1782 re 1 Petition, filed by Suzlon Wind Energy Corporation, USA, Suzlon Infrastructure Limited, Suzlon Energy Ltd, SE Shipping Pte., Ltd., Suzlon Structures Pte., Ltd., Suzlon Energy Australia Pty Ltd. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 12, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Beluga Shipping Gmbh & Co. KD "Beluga Fantastic" v. Suzlon Energy Ltd., Federal Court Proceedings, NSD 1670 of 2008 before the Federal Court, New Sourth Wales, Australia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suzlon Energy Ltd
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suzlon Energy Australia Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suzlon Infrastructure Limited
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suzlon Wind Energy Corporation, USA
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Suzlon Structures Pte., Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SE Shipping Pte., Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?