Lompa Farms, Inc v. Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lompa Farms, Inc
Defendant: Old West Export, Inc, S. Surabian & Sons, Garth Ramseier, Max Cardy, Diann Anderson, Dave Muse, Lane A Anderson, Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC, M. Park Inc, Hyun J. Kim, Albert O Surabian, Sr. and Mary Flora
Case Number: 5:2011cv00062
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING 119 Stipulation for Order for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Lompa Farms, Inc. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Dismiss. The second, third and fourth counts of the FAC are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. The motion is denied as to the eighth count for unjust enrichment. The hearing scheduled for 3/23/2012 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The above-entitled matter is scheduled for a Preliminary Pretrial Conference on March 2, 2012 (see 78 ). Although the parties failed to file a Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement as requ ired, the court nonetheless finds a Preliminary Pretrial Conference premature at this time due to the pending Motion to Dismiss. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 5/1/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/28/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 73 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 84 Motion for Joinder; Granting 87 Motion to Set Aside Default. The hearing scheduled for 1/27/2012 is VACATED. Based on the foregoing: Cardey's Motion to Set Aside (Docket Item No. 87) is GRANTED and the default set aside. Cardey shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading on or before February 8, 2012. Cardey's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 73) is GRANTED. Counts I, VII, and IX of the FAC are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/25/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012) Modified text on 1/25/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 93 Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice as to Anchor Warehouse and Garth Ramseier only. Garth Ramseier (individually), Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC (individually) and Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC (individually) terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/11/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE AND EXTENDING DEADLINES IN SCHEDULING ORDER re 76 Stipulation. Close of Discovery due by 2/24/2012. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statements due 2/24/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/201211:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 57 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 25 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Moving Defendants' motion to dismiss Counts I, VII, and IX is GRANTED with leave to amend. Any amended complaint must be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/13/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continue Deadline for Filing Joint Case Management Conference Statement re 49 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/13/201. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 15, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A"CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 7, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lompa Farms, Inc v. Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old West Export, Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Surabian & Sons
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garth Ramseier
Represented By: Patrick John Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Cardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diann Anderson
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Muse
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane A Anderson
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Warehouse Services, LLC
Represented By: Patrick John Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Park Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyun J. Kim
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert O Surabian, Sr.
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Flora
Represented By: Charles Kendall Manock
Represented By: Elisabeth Fullmer Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lompa Farms, Inc
Represented By: Kathryn S. Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?