Hayes v. Hedgpeth et al
Petitioner: Milton N. Hayes
Respondent: Salinas Valley State Prison and Anthony Hedgpeth
Case Number: 5:2011cv00161
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT. For the reasons stated in the order denying the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, judgment is entered in favor of Respondent and against Petitioner. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/1/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 19 Letter filed by Milton N. Hayes, 18 Letter filed by Milton N. Hayes. Accordingly, Petitioner's motion for Appoint of counsel, (Docket Item No. 18 ) is DENIED and Docket Item No. 19 i s DENIED as duplicative. This denial is without prejudice to the Court's sua sponte reconsideration should the Court later find an evidentiary hearing necessary following consideration of the merits of Petitioner's claims. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge James Ware Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Hedgpeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Salinas Valley State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Milton N. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?