Earll v. eBay, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Plaintiff: Melissa J Earll
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00262
Filed: January 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss. All of the causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Since this order effectively resolves the case, judgment will be entered in favor of Defendant. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/12. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Edward J. Davila (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Hon. Edward J. Davila granting 66 Motion to Dismiss. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 71 STIPULATION. The 3/9/2012 Case Management Conference and associated deadlines are VACATED. The court will address scheduling issues further in the order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/29/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earll v. eBay, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa J Earll
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Represented By: Michael J Aschenbrener
Represented By: Williams G. Crowe
Represented By: Christopher L. Dore
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Anne DeGooyer
Represented By: David M. Eisenberg
Represented By: Mary T. Huser
Represented By: Wendy M. Lazerson
Represented By: John Anthony Polito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?