San Francisco Technology Inc. v. BRK Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: San Francisco Technology Inc.
Defendant: BRK Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00354
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice of BRK Brands Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41 (a) re 21 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Against BRK Brands, Inc. filed by BRK Brands, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Motion to Stay without Prejudice re 19 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEVER AND TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on March 16, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Regarding Severance of Claims Against BRK Brands, Inc. 1 Complaint filed by San Francisco Technology Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/9/2010. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Technology Inc. v. BRK Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Technology Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Represented By: Daniel Harlan Fingerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRK Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Allan McFarlane
Represented By: S. Mark Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?