Chiu v. Apple, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Anthony Chiu
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv00407
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re (30 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding MDL Panel Conditional Transfer Order transferring tag-along actions to Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Koh on 9/9/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 30 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the action listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California is transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending there and listed on Schedule A. *** Reference must be made to individual docket sheets for entries relating only to individual actions *** (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 177 Permitting Hogan Lovells US LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Apple, Inc. and Quattro Wireless, Inc. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 28 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/10/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 8/10/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 9/1/2011 Motion Hearing continued to 9/8/2011 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Regarding August 10, 2011 Case Management Conference and September 1, 2011 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/4/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/4/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 154 Adopting Stipulation for 2-Day Extension to File Reply. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/29/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Adopting 149 Stipulation to file Over-Length Brief. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/12/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 23 Order Denying 72 Motion to Stay in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/31/2011. Associated Cases: 5:10-cv-05878-LHK, 5:10-cv-05881-LHK, 5:11-cv-00407-LHK, 5:11-cv-00700-LHK, 5:11-cv-01828-LHK, 5:11-cv-02110-LHK, 5:11-cv-02270-LHK, 5:11-cv-02317-LHK. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (110) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Cases 10-CV-02110, 11-CV-02270 and 11-CV-02317 are related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; denying (80) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK. Case 11-CV-02167 is not related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/25/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/25/2011), Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 5/25/2011) re (72 in 5:10-cv-05878-LHK) MOTION to Stay Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Proceedings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/25/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (68) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK.Case 11-cv-01828 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Expediting Motion Hearing re Defendant Apple's Motion to Stay and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/5/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 17 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 4/6/2011). (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re (49 in 5:10-cv-05878-LHK) Notice (Other) filed by Anthony Chiu. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/1/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:10-cv-05881-LHK; granting (50) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:10-cv-05878-LHK (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 33 Adopting Stipulation to Consolidate Related Cases, as Modified by the Court. The Related Cases: 10-cv-5878-LHK, 10-cv-5881-LHK, 11-cv-0407-LHK, and 11-cv-0700-LHK shall be consolidated into a single case in Lalo v. Apple, 10-cv-5878-LHK. As specified in this Order, the Consolidated Action shall bear the following caption: In re iPhone Application Litigation, No. 10-CV-5878 LHK (PSG). Signed by Judge Koh on 3/15/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011) ** For Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Action C10-05878 LHK** Modified text on 3/18/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 13 ). Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE. This case is related to 10-05878. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Case Management Order No. 1 by Anthony Chiu. (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Apple, Inc. (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Charlson (Charlson, Michael) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Chiu. Apple, Inc served on 2/1/2011, answer due 2/22/2011. (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 2/01/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge And Request For Reassignment To A United States District Judge by Anthony Chiu. (Kim, Sabrina) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for All San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders U. S. District Court Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Local Rule 3-16 by Anthony Chiu (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 1 Class Action Alleged COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009010). Filed byAnthony Chiu. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiu v. Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chiu
Represented By: Sabrina S. Kim
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Represented By: Michael L. Charlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?