Soria Eduardo & Socorro et al v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Soria Eduardo & Socorro
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC and Quality Loan Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv00584
Filed: February 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a) re 23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Soria Eduardo & Socorro. The Clerk is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing Hearing Date and CMC to June 16, 2011 re 20 . Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/25/11. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re Briefing Schedule on Request for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/8/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soria Eduardo & Socorro et al v. Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soria Eduardo & Socorro
Represented By: Ekaterina Kashlinsky
Represented By: Kenneth Raymond Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: T. Robert Finlay
Represented By: Lukasz Iwo Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?