TEK Global S.R.L. et.al. v. Sealant Systems International Inc. et.al.
Plaintiff: Sealant Systems International, Inc
Defendant: TEK Global, S.R.L.
Case Number: 5:2011cv00774
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1). Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/6/2020. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER re 571 Modifying Permanent Injunction; Denying Ex Parte Application for Order Modifying Permanent Injunction as to Disputed Products; Setting a Briefing Schedule for Noticed Motion. Signed by Judge Chhabria on October 11, 2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 564 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 8/11/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER RE HEARING ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/18/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/6/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 FURTHER ORDER RE TRIAL EXHIBITS 60 AND 145. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/12/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER RE TRIAL EXHIBITS 55, 56, 60, AND 145. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 3/10/2017. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER REASSIGNING ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/20/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON INVALIDITY by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 368 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL REBUTTAL REPORT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 4, 2016, re 373 , 374 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 30, 2016. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER DENYING 312 MOTION TO STAY, DENYING MOTION TO EXTEND SUNSET PERIOD AND GRANTING MOTION TO MODIFY INJUNCTION by Judge Grewal. (Grewal, Paul) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART POST-TRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 243 , 244 , 245 , 246 and 247 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR BRINGING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 186 Stipulation (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 146 Motion in Limine (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY RELATING TO TEK'S CONSTRUCTIONS OF CLAIM LANGUAGE THAT CONFLICT WITH THE COURT'S CONSTRUCTIONS, granting 165 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/29/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal finding as moot 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 103 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING 131 JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS TO ISSUE SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 27, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 91 Stipulation filed by Accessories Marketing, Inc, Sealant Systems International, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 14, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/29/2012. psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012).
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING PILLBUSRY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN LLC'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 75 Motion to Withdraw 75 MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN LLP TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FURTHER AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 73 Stipulation, filed by TEK Corporation, Accessories Marketing, Inc, TEK Global, S.R.L., Sealant Systems International, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE PARTIES' MOTIONS TO DISMISS CLAIMS FOR WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 42 Motion to Dismiss; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 55 Stipulation filed by TEK Corporation, TEK Global, S.R.L. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 16, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND (2) PATENT INFRINGEMENT re 35 Exhibits, filed by Accessories Marketing, Inc, Sealant Systems International, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 14, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 12, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 8, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TEK Global S.R.L. et.al. v. Sealant Systems International Inc. et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sealant Systems International, Inc
Represented By: Gregory Stuart Cordrey
Represented By: Stanley Martin Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEK Global, S.R.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?