McAfee et al v. Francis
Plaintiff: Jayna Sutherland, Jimmy J McAfee and Mona Sutherland
Defendant: Thomas Francis
Case Number: 5:2011cv00821
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh in case 5:11-cv-00821-LHK; granting (20) Motion to Dismiss in case 5:12-cv-05110-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:12-cv-05110-LHK, 5:11-cv-00821-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 82 Motion to Relate Case.Case 12-cv-05110 is related to this case (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/28/2013 (mpb, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 72 Stipulated Request to Continue Mediation Deadline.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/26/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 68 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendant Francis' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2012 before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/1/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 37 Defendant Neptune's Account LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 56 Stipulation to Continue March 1, 2012 Case Management Conference. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 46 Substitution of Counsel filed by Mona Sutherland. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 43 Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST re 32 Request to appear telephonically filed by Mona Sutherland, Jayna Sutherland, Jimmy J McAfee. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/14/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 5 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. The August 4, 2011 Motion Hearing is Vacated. The August 4, 2011 Case Management Conference is continued to October 19, 2011 at 2PM. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAfee et al v. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayna Sutherland
Represented By: Rod Kenneth Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy J McAfee
Represented By: Rod Kenneth Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Sutherland
Represented By: Rod Kenneth Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Francis
Represented By: Ferdie Fox Franklin
Represented By: Alex Pevzner
Represented By: Alexander F Pevzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?