Sanchez v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Margarita M Sanchez
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDEX West, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv00959
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 30 Entry of Judgment.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE For Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/28/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 22 Ex Parte Application. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 15 Motion for TRO and Ordering Plaintiff to Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarita M Sanchez
Represented By: Kathleen OSullivan Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy E Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?