J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Trujillo
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Defendant: Josefina Trujillo
Case Number: 5:2011cv01159
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (45) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-01159-LHK; granting (19) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-05443-LHK; granting (43) Stipulation in case 5:11-cv-01170-LHK (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (37) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:11-cv-01159-LHK. 11-05443 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/6/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 28 Motion to Relate Case. Case 11-cv-01170 is related to this case. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Appointing Pro Bono Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/29/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/30/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving Stipulated Extension. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/2/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc v. Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefina Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?