May 24, 2019 |
Filing
187
ORDER striking 168 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; Granting 170 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/24/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
|
December 5, 2017 |
Filing
150
ORDER denying 131 Motion to Certify Class. The hearing scheduled for 12/7/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing
115
ORDER Denying 94 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying as Moot 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay. The case is hereby scheduled for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 6/1/2017. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 5/25/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/1/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss. The clerk shall close this file upon entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/30/2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) Modified on 9/30/2013 (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF).
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing
72
ORDER GRANTING 71 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling filed by Kurt Adzema, Jerry S. Rawls, Finisar Corporation, Eitan Gertel. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Kurt Adzema, Finisar Corpora tion, Eitan Gertel, Jerry S. Rawls: Opposition due by 3/20/2013. Reply due by 4/3/2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/27/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
|
January 16, 2013 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 56 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before 2/6/2013. The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference on 3/8/2013 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement on or before 3/1/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/16/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
|
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
55
STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT re 54 STIPULATION. Deadline to file Motion to Dismiss due by 3/23/2012. Opposition due by 4/23/2012. Reply due by 5/18/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/16/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
|
January 6, 2012 |
Filing
52
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Revised Scheduling of Consolidated Complaint re 51 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2012. Deadline to File Motion to Dismiss due by 3/16/2012. All other dates in 50 Order remain as previously set: Opposition due by 4/16/2012. Reply due by 5/11/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
|
November 7, 2011 |
Filing
50
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Scheduling of Consolidated Complaint and Case Caption re 49 Stipulation. The case shall be recaptioned "In re Finisar Corporation Securities Litigation," retaining its case number (5:11-CV-01252-EJD). Amend ed Pleadings due by 1/13/2012. Motion due by 3/13/2012. Opposition due by 4/16/2012. Reply due by 5/11/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/07/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
|
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING (1) MOTIONS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF ALL RELATED ACTIONS; AND (2) THE MOTION OF OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION AND RETIREMENT SYSTEM FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL; denying in part and granti ng in part (26) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; denying in part and granting in part (28) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; denying in part and granting in part (18) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 5:11-cv-01252-EJD. These cases shall be consolidated under the lower case num ber, 5:11-CV-01252-EJD, and case number 5:11-CV-01635-EJD shall be administratively closed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants and the appointed lead counsel shall meet and confer in order to agree on a schedule for the next stage of the case, incl uding the timing for the consolidated complaint and motion to dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Case Management Conference will be held in this matter before the Honorable Edward J. Davila on December 9, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 1, 5th Floor, 280 S. First Street, San Jose, California. On or before December 2, 2011 the parties shall file a joint case management conference statement. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2011 (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011) Modified text on 10/27/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
36
Order Granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ximena R. Skovron. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
17
ORDER Granting [12 in 5:11-cv-01252-EJD] Motion to Relate Case with C-11-1278 CW, C-11-1635 PJH. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court shall immediately relate Derchi-Russo v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1252 EJD to Wilson v. Finisar Corpor ation, et al., Case N o. CV 11-1278 CW and Wade v. Finisar Corporation, et al., Case No. CV 11-1635 PJH. The parties in all three cases shall appear for a Case Management Conference on June 15, 2011 at 9 a.m. On or before June 6, 2011, the parties sh all file a Joint Case Management Statement. The Statement shall address whether the cases should be consolidated and if so, a schedule for nomination of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 5/4/2011. (Order posted corrects typographical error case number re Order Relating Case in 16 in 5:11-cv-01252-EJD, 14 in 5:11-cv-01278-EJD and 12 in 4:11-cv-01635-PJH). (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
|