Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Be et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Pete Be and Da Kine Cafe, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01333
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT re 24 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 26, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing to 10/27/2011 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Davoli, David) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 24 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/6/2011. Replies due by 10/13/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration)(Davoli, David) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
July 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Vacating July 29, 2011 Case Management Conference in light of Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/24/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 22 Clerks Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Related documents(s) 15 )(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Amendment to Declaration in Support of Request to Enter Default, on defendant DA KINE CAFE, INC. d/b/a DA KINE CAFE (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Amendment to Declaration in Support of Request to Enter Default, on defendant Pete Be (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 19 Declaration of David J. Davoli in Support of 15 Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s Request to Enter Default filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Responses due by 7/1/2011. (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/17/2011) Modified on 6/27/2011 counsel posted document incorrectly as a motion and failed to link entry to document #15 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2011 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Request to Enter Default and Declaration in Support of Request to Enter Default, on defendant Da Kine Cafe, Inc. d/b/a Da Kine Cafe (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Request to Enter Default and Declaration in Support of Request to Enter Default, on defendant Pete Be (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 16 Declaration of David J. Davoli In Support of Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.'s Request to Enter Default filed byJoe Hand Promotions Inc. (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 15 First MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Responses due by 6/27/2011. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Notice of Change of Address on defendant Da Kine Cafe, Inc. d/b/a Da Kine Cafe (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc of Notice of Change of Address on defendant Pete Be (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by David John Davoli (Davoli, David) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/20/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 6/21/2011 Case Management Conference Vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 9 TERMINATING 6/21/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Davoli, David) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 7 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Pete Be on 3/22/11, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Davoli, David) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 6 Proof of Service of Service Summons and Complaint served on Da Kine Cafe on 3/22/11, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Davoli, David) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 5 *** DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET ( 7 )*** Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Pete Be on 3/22/11, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Davoli, David) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Text modified on 4/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Da Kine Cafe, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Pete Be. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) against Pete Be, Da Kine Cafe, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009318.). Filed byJoe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Be et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: David John Davoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Be
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Da Kine Cafe, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?