C.A.M. Social Development, LLC v. Thinkwell Group, Inc
Plaintiff: C.A.M. Social Development, LLC
Defendant: Thinkwell Group, Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv01361
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 21 Order to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/18/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extending Time for Counter-Defendant C.A.M. Social Development, LLC to Respond to Counter-Complaint re 14 Stipulation. Response due 6/17/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011) Modified text on 6/8/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until May 20, 2011 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Further, all parties who have not yet done so shall either consent or decline magistrate jurisdiction by April 25, 2011. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/19/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.A.M. Social Development, LLC v. Thinkwell Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thinkwell Group, Inc
Represented By: Clifford Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.M. Social Development, LLC
Represented By: Mark W. Good
Represented By: Perry James Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?