Low v. Linkedin Corporation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Kevin Low
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv01468
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2012 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2012 01:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 39 Statement of Recent Decision by Linkedin Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 38 REPLY (re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 37 CORRECTED OPPOSITION to ( 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed by Kevin Low, Alan Masand. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 2/2/2012) Modified text on 2/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2012 Filing 36 OPPOSITION to ( 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed by Kevin Low, Alan Masand. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 2/2/2012) Modified text on 2/3/2012 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Filing 35 Proposed Order re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Linkedin Corporation. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 9, 2012 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 2/2/2012. Replies due by 2/17/2012. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 30 Stipulation filed by Kevin Low. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Linkedin Corporation. Filed byKevin Low, Alan Masand. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 Filing 30 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation Setting A Briefing Schedule For Motion To Dismiss And Adjourning December 14, 2011, Case Management Conference) by Kevin Low. (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Staying Discovery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/11/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO AMEND OR ADD PARTIES by Linkedin Corporation. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 25 APPLICATION of Kim E. Richman for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065929.) by Kevin Low. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Kim E. Richman for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611065929.) filed by Kevin Low. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/15/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 9/15/2011) re 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Linkedin Corporation, Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Lucy H. Koh (Date Filed: 9/15/2011). The Court took the motion under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order on Motion. Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 21 Proposed Order re 20 APPLICATION of Melissa Ryan Clark for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611010350) by Kevin Low. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Melissa Ryan Clark for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611010350) filed by Kevin Low. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Linkedin Corporation, Kevin Low. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 17 REPLY (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLinkedin Corporation. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE (re 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byKevin Low. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FOLLOW MOTION HEARING Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Linkedin Corporation (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Linkedin Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 8/1/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/8/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 11 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Linkedin Corporation. (Friedman, Mali) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re ( 1 ) and to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Linkedin Corporation. (Frankel, Simon) (Filed on 6/3/2011) Linkage added on 6/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re ( 1 ); and to Set Out Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss by Kevin Low. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified on 5/17/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re ( 1 ) by Kevin Low. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter E. Seidman. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 5 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Peter E. Seidman to appear in Pro Hac Vice re 4 by Kevin Low. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 4 Application for Admission of Attorney Peter E. Seidman to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009417) filed by Kevin Low. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 25, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California, # 2 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, # 3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Linkedin Corporation. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Linkedin Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009359). Filed by Kevin Low. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Low v. Linkedin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Low
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Peter E. Seidman
Represented By: Anne Marie Vu
Represented By: Belinda Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?