Pham et al v. City of San Jose et al
Plaintiff: Vinh Huu Pham and Lan Thi Do
Defendant: City of San Jose, Brian Jeffrey and Matthew Blackerby
Case Number: 5:2011cv01526
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on September 30, 2013. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The Court finds that a conference would not be productive at this time. Accordingly, the Conference is VACATED. The Court shall set a Preliminary Pretrial Conference, if necessary, in its forthcoming order on summary judgment. ***9/20/2013 PTC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties joint statement, the court finds that a pretrial conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for July 5, 2013, i s CONTINUED to September 20, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall file an updated Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement on or before September 10, 2013.***7/5/2013 Deadlines terminated. [ Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 47 Pretrial Conference Statement filed by Brian Jeffrey, City of San Jose, Matthew Blackerby. Updated Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 6/25/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/14/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting 45 Stipulation Deadline to Disclose Experts; Modifying Briefing Schedule. No later than TEN (10) days after the Court's ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, the parties shall file a stipulation or administrative motion to reset the expert disclosure deadlines. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/27/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES. Fact Discovery cutoff 10/1/2012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2012. Expert Discovery cutoff 2/3/2013. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 11/20 /2012. Preliminar Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motions terminated: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Vinh Huu Pham. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Modify Deadline to Hold ENE Session re 18 Stipulation. The Court hereby extends the deadline to hold an Early Neutral Evaluation in this case to January 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation re 15 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/13/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pham et al v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinh Huu Pham
Represented By: Stuart D. Kirchick
Represented By: Teresa Thu Huong Hung-Nguyen
Represented By: Paul F. Caputo
Represented By: Charles F. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lan Thi Do
Represented By: Paul F. Caputo
Represented By: Charles F. Hawkins
Represented By: Teresa Thu Huong Hung-Nguyen
Represented By: Stuart D. Kirchick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose
Represented By: Michael J. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Jeffrey
Represented By: Michael J. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Blackerby
Represented By: Michael J. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?