Freiria v. Ebay Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Francisco Freiria
Defendant: EBay Inc, Bank of America Corporation, Deborah Braun and Patrick Anderson
Case Number: 5:2011cv01808
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Change Venue filed by Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez on behalf of Francisco Freiria, Ebay Inc. (Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla) Modified on 3/29/2011 to add filer(ab).
March 18, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss or Transfer Venue and for Attorneys' Fees and Memorandum of Law filed by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of Ebay Inc Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/4/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 2a, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo) Modified on 3/21/2011 as to title (ab).
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 2/16/2011. (LL)
February 15, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2011 to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, filed by Francisco Freiria filed by Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach on behalf of Ebay Inc Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/3/2011 (Related document(s) 1 ) (Zayas-Marxuach, Eduardo)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 16 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 2/1/2011. (LL)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER finding as moot 15 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 2/1/2011. (LL)
February 1, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to 14 Opposition to 10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/17/2011 (Rivera-Morales, Jose) Modified as to title on 2/2/2011 (ab).
February 1, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File reply to Docket 14-Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/17/2011 (Rivera-Morales, Jose) Noted on 2/2/2011: incomple pdf (ab).
January 31, 2011 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Francisco Freiria Re: 10 MOTION to dismiss as to Francisco Freiria filed by Bank of America Corporation filed by Francisco Freiria. (Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to Motion Deadline due by 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 12/17/2010. (LL)
December 16, 2010 Filing 12 First MOTION for extension of time until 04/25/2011 to Serve Ebay Inc. and Co-defendants Debroah Braun and Patrick Anderson filed by Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/3/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla)
December 16, 2010 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply until January 31, 2011 as to 10 MOTION to dismiss as to Francisco Freiria filed by Bank of America Corporation filed by Carla Arraiza-Gonzalez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/3/2011 (Related document(s) 10 ) (Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla)
December 8, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/27/2010 (Rivera-Morales, Jose) Modified as to title on 12/9/2010 (ab).
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear PHV; granting 8 Motion to Appear PHV Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 11/16/2010. (LL)
November 10, 2010 Filing 8 Motion to allow Marc T. Parrino to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number PRX100002805) filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation (Rivera-Morales, Jose)
November 10, 2010 Filing 7 Motion to allow J. Randolph Liebler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $150 receipt number PRX100002804) filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation (Rivera-Morales, Jose)
November 10, 2010 Filing Fee Received $ 150.00, receipt number PRX1000002804 (re: PHV/ J. Randolph Liebler) and $150.00, receipt number PRX100002805 (re: PHV/Marc. T Parrino). (ga)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 12/8/2010. Signed by Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory on 11/9/2010. (LL)
November 8, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Special Appearance to Request Additional Period of Time to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Defend re: 1 Complaint, filed by Francisco Freiria filed by Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales on behalf of Bank of America Corporation Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2010 (Related document(s) 1 ) (Rivera-Morales, Jose)
October 8, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Ebay Inc. (al)
September 27, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING of Summons re: 1 Complaint. (ab)
September 27, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A Garcia-Gregory (jla)
September 24, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0104-2108643.), filed by Francisco Freiria. Service due by 1/25/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Summons Ebay Inc., # 2 Category Sheet, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Current Address Notice, # 5 Summons Bank of America Corporation)(Arraiza-Gonzalez, Carla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freiria v. Ebay Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBay Inc
Represented By: Alberto F. Tellechea-Hermida
Represented By: Eduardo A. Zayas-Marxuach
Represented By: Tianjing Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Casey John McTigue
Represented By: Casey J Wraight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Freiria
Represented By: Carla Arraiza Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?