McCloskey v. D & J Hillview LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rosa McCloskey
Defendant: Cambridge Property Management, Secure Horizons USA, Inc, Individual Practice Association Medical Group of Santa Clara County, Inc, D & J Hillview LLC and Laboratory Corporation of America
Case Number: 5:2011cv01823
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to FRCP 4l(a)(1) re 34 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 29, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/13/2012 09:00 AM. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 1/5/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Order to Show Cause issued August 30, 2011, is hereby DISCHARGED. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 13, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The court hereby issues an order to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. If plaintiff does not, by September 27, 2011, either (1) demonstrate compliance with paragraphs 5 and 6 of General Order No. 56, or (2) demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the Court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the Court.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/13/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
July 14, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Secure Horizons USA, Inc., Individual Practice Association Medical Group of Santa Clara County re 26 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Secure Horizons USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 24, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 19 Stipulation. Response due 7/6/2011 by Individual Practice Association Medical Group of Santa Clara County. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 14, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America re 15 Stipulation. Laboratory Corporation of America response due 6/29/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 8, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint re 11 Stipulation. Response due for Secure Horizons USA, Inc. by 6/27/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 3, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 8 Stipulation. Individual Practice Association Medical Group of Santa Clara County, Inc. response due 6/21/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/3/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloskey v. D & J Hillview LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secure Horizons USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Practice Association Medical Group of Santa Clara County, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & J Hillview LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa McCloskey
Represented By: Catherine M. Cabalo
Represented By: Celia Louise McGuinness
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?