Nguyen v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tamise Nguyen
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company, Decisionone Group Life Insurance Policy and Decisionone
Case Number: 5:2011cv02275
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a) re 23 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT re 21 Certification of Mediation Session filed by Andre Hassid. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 12/9/2011. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Continuing Case Management Conference from 9/2/2011 to 9/9/2011 and for Counsel to Participate by Telephone re 12 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th F loor, San Jose. Counsel is directed to contact Court Call Phone Conferencing at (866) 582-6878 in advance of the hearing to schedule a telephonic appearance. Please tell Court Call you have been approved for a telephonic appearance by the Court. The parties are to adhere to Court Call's procedures. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Standard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamise Nguyen
Represented By: Charles J. Fleishman
Represented By: Paul Amos Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decisionone Group Life Insurance Policy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decisionone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?