Vincent McLaughlin et al v. Owens et al
Plaintiff: Vincent McLaughlin and Raquel Ray-McLaughlin
Defendant: The McClatchey Company, Terri Owens, Media News Group, Inc and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2011cv02287
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 11/2/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Order to Show Cause shall b e automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to file a joint statement if a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) is filed on or before 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER CONTINUING 9/14/2012 SHOW CAUSE HEARING re 55 Response to Order to Show Cause. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 9/28/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. All other pretrial deadlines, motions and hearing dates are vacated. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 9/7/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 40 Motion to Strike ; granting 31 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. The motion hearings scheduled for 3/16/2012 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila On 3/14/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING 2/3/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; EXTENDING FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE; SETTING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Fact Discovery cutoff 7/1/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 5/29/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent McLaughlin et al v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McClatchey Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media News Group, Inc
Represented By: Gregory Charles Simonian
Represented By: Valerie Suzanne Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tad A. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael Edwin Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Ray-McLaughlin
Represented By: Michael Edwin Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?