Brown et al v. Young Featured Case
Plaintiff: Bridget Brown and Bella Bridesmaid, LLC
Defendant: Yvonne Young
Case Number: 5:2011cv02517
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2011 Filing 18 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown. (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 8/2/2011) Modified on 8/3/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2011 Filing 17 Notice of Unopposed Motion and Motion for an Order Permitting Owens Tarabichi LLP to Withdraw as Counsel for defendant; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Yvonne Young. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Responses due by 8/4/2011. Replies due by 8/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Tarabichi, Bruno) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 Filing 16 Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 5 (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Linkage added on 7/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2011 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint re 1 ; with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM against Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown by Yvonne Young. (Tarabichi, Bruno) (Filed on 7/5/2011) Linkage added on 7/6/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2011 Filing 14 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yvonne Young. (Tarabichi, Bruno) (Filed on 6/29/2011) Modified on 6/29/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 11 Defendant's Motion to Change Time of the Opposition, Reply, and Hearing Dates on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant's opposition is due by July 19, 2011. Plaintiffs' reply is due by August 2, 2011. Plaintiffs' motion will be heard on August 23, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/24/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 12 Letter to Judge Lloyd (re 11 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary InjunctionEmergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown. (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 6/27/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Time of the Opposition, Reply, and Hearing Dates on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3 re 5 filed by Yvonne Young. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bruno Tarabichi , # 2 (Proposed) Order) (Tarabichi, Bruno) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Text modified on 6/24/2011 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown. (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Personal Service on Defendant Yvonne Young of Summonsd and Complaint as to 2 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Newton, by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/17/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re ( 6 ) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: DEADLINE FOR CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGEby Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re ( 5 ) by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown (Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: DEADLINE FOR CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All parties who have not yet done so shall, no later than June 21, 2011, file either (1) a Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge or (2) a Declination to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. See N.D. Cal. Civ. R. 73-1. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 5 Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Bella Bridesmaid, LLC, Bridget Brown. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bridget Brown, # 2 Declaration of Dawn Newton, # 3 t Declaration of Jeff Tofanelli, # 4 Declaration of Whitney Slatkin, # 5 Declaration of Kevin Chin, # 6 Declaration of Andrew Weeks, # 7Declaration of Nancy Chin, # 8Declaration of Amy Kuschel, # 9 Declaration of Lindsie Jones, # 10 Declaration of Angie Silvy, # 11 Supplement Briefing Schedule, # 12(Proposed) Order )(Newton, Dawn) (Filed on 6/10/2011) Text modified on 6/13/2011; incorrect event type used when posting Declarations (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2011 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2011: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Yvonne Young. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, False Advertising, Cybersquatting, Unfair Competition, False Promise and Breach of Contract (Summons Issued); jury trial; against Yvonne Young ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611007032). Filed by Bridget Brown, Bella Bridesmaid, LLC. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Brown
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Dawn Newton
Represented By: Ilse C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella Bridesmaid, LLC
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Dawn Newton
Represented By: Ilse C. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?