Smith v. Qwest Communications Company, LLC et al Featured Case

A California land owner filed a class action lawsuit against four telecommunication companies — Level 3, Qwest, Sprint, and Wiltel Communications — over whether they had the right to install equipment, lines, and cable within the railroad rights of way, but without compensating or getting consent from property owners next to or under the railroads' rights of way.

Plaintiff: Todd Smith
Defendant: Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Level 3 Communications, LLC and Wiltel Communications, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv02599
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Filing 14 Order Signed by The Honorable Thelton E. Henderson granting re 13 Application for Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney William T. Gotfryd. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Attorney William T. Gotfryd for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice - [Filing Fee: $275.00, Receipt Number 54611010549] filed by Plaintiff Todd Smith. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order) (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 12 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Level 3 Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Wiltel Communications, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing Inc., Corporate Parent Level 3 Communications, Inc., Other Affiliate Level 3 Communications, LLC for Wiltel Communications, LLC; Corporate Parent Quest Communications International, Inc., Corporate Parent CenturyLink, Inc., Other Affiliate Qwest Services Corporation for Qwest Communications Company, LLC; Corporate Parent Sprint Nextel Corporation for Sprint Communications Company L.P.; Corporate Parent Level 3 Financing Inc., Corporate Parent Level 3 Communications, Inc. for Level 3 Communications, LLC. (Newland, Molly) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER 1) STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT; 2) EXTENSION OF DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; AND 3) CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/11/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 10, 2011 Filing 10 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re (1) Stay of Proceedings Pending Finalization of Settlement; (2) Extension of Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint; and (3) Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Level 3 Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Wiltel Communications, LLC & Todd Smith. (Newland, Molly) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE on Reassignment. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/28/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE The Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 is CONTINUED to 10/21/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/15/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 4 TERMINATING 8/23/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 8/23/2011 Case Management Conference is hereby Vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 9, 2011 Filing 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Todd Smith. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 31, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 1 Alleged Class Action Complaint for Trespass and Quasi Contract-Unjust Enrichment (NO PROCESS); jury demand; against Level 3 Communications, LLC, Qwest Communications Company, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Wiltel Communications, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009774). Filed by Todd Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Qwest Communications Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Forster
Represented By: William T Gotfryd
Represented By: Steven R. Levy
Represented By: Arthur T. Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Communications Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiltel Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?