Righetti v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Righetti
Defendant: Anthony Hedgpeth, Michael Evans, Charles Dudley Lee, Michael Sepulveda, Duc Nguyen, Kathleen Wall, Mark Hudson, Peter Chalich, Ida Guzman, Marcella Zuniga, Harry Wels, William Benda, Jr., Michael Mueller, Nell Richman, William Mathis, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and Natividad Medical Center
Case Number: 5:2011cv02717
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation to Dismiss This Action With Prejudice) filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING 241 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY BY THIRTY DAYS. 240 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to extend time to take the depositions of Dr. Moeller and Mr. Cristobal Alcaraz (TERMINATED). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT IDA GUZMAN SHALL BE FILED BY 5/29/14. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 149 156 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 200 Clerks Notice, /Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Marcella Zuniga, Duc Nguyen Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Conduct Settlement Conference filed by Marcella Zuniga, Duc Nguyen Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 148 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Administrative Motion to Withdraw Counsel and [Proposed] Order filed by Gerald Righetti. Attorney Dixie Lee Noonan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Stipulated Jointly] filed by Gerald Righetti. Motion due: 11/14/13. Responses due by 12/12/2013. Replies due by 1/6/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2014 01:30 PM in Co urtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal of the Claim Against Defendant Dr. William Benda, Jr. filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 138 Stipulated Protective Order filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 100 Plaintiff's Motion File Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint as to Defendant Richman and Proposed Order Thereon filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel filed by Duc Nguyen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER _ EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [L.R. 6-1(a)] __ filed by Gerald Righetti, Neil Richman. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 85 Stipulation filed by Duc Nguyen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 64 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint as to Defendant Benda filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 55 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Ida Guzman. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 48 52 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 68 Notice of Additional Counsel filed by Gerald Righetti. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 9/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 To Extend Time to Respond and Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by State Defendants filed by Gerald Righetti, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to Respond and Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by State Defendants, 54 MOTION to Dismiss /The State Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss (F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6)); Memorandum of Points and Authorities., ***Deadlines terminated. 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to Respond and Reply to Motion to Dismiss filed by State Defendants filed by Gerald Righetti. Responses due by 9/14/2012. Replies due by 9/21/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righetti v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hedgpeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dudley Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duc Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Chalich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ida Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcella Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Wels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Benda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nell Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natividad Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?