Ung et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ryan Ung, Chi Cheng and Alice Rosen
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv02829
Filed: June 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Chi Cheng, Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung (Seidman, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 40 Declaration of Matthew D. Brown in Support of 38 Brief, Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction under the Class Action Fairness Act (28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 39 Declaration of Jas Athwal in Support of 38 Brief, Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction under the Class Action Fairness Act (28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 38 Brief re 1 Notice of Removal,, 37 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction under the Class Action Fairness Act (28 U.S.C. Section 1332(d)) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1 , 37 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDERING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Facebook, Inc.s Statement of Recent Decision Relevant to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 10 , 31 , 33 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 28, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion To Designate Interim Class Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 35 Declaration of Jeff S. Westerman in Support of 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion To Designate Interim Class Counsel filed byChi Cheng, Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion To Designate Interim Class Counsel filed by Chi Cheng, Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (Westerman, Jeff) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 5, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 32 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Facebook, Inc.s CORRECTED Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint (Correcting Date in Caption). (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 32 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 11 Declaration in Support, 31 Reply to Opposition/Response, 12 Request for Judicial Notice, 16 Opposition/Response to Motion, 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Facebook, Inc.s Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 31 REPLY (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) Facebook, Inc.s Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2011 01:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Peter Seidman (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sanford P. Dumain (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Melissa Ryan Clark (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Charles Slidders (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 24 Proposed Order re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064812.) by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Peter Seidman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064812.) filed by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 22 Proposed Order re 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064814.) by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney Sanford P. Dumain for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064814.) filed by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064813.) by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Melissa Ryan Clark for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064813.) filed by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 18 Proposed Order re 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064815.) by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney Charles Slidders for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611064815.) filed by Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE (re 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ) filed byChi Cheng, Alice Rosen, Ryan Ung. (Vu, Anne Marie) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF CMC (approving 14 ). The Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/18/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 14 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Continuance of CMC by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 11 Declaration of ANA YANG MULLER in Support of 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 10 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss FACEBOOK, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 9/1/2011. Replies due by 9/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE Honorable Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall be the initials JF after the case number Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal remains as the referral judge Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on June 21, 2011. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified text on 7/7/2011, (to conform with document posted) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 8 TERMINATING 7/5/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 7/5/2011 Case Management Conference is hereby Vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 7 DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE by Facebook, Inc. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/20/2011) Modified on 6/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/23/2011 Case Management Conference reset to 7/5/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2011. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent" or "Declination" to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 6/28/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 5 Certificate Of Service Of Notice To Adverse Parties of Removal To Federal Court And Related Papers re ( 4 ) by Facebook, Inc (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/13/2011) Modified on 6/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2011 Filing 4 Notice To Plaintiffs of Removal of Civil Action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California from Santa Clara County Superior Court. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 6/13/2011) Text modified on 6/14/2011; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement (Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1) and Certification of Interested Entities and Persons (Civil Local Rule 3-16) and by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (No Process); Jury demand; (See Attachment #3 for Alleged Classe Action Complaint) from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 111CV200467. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611009835). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011: # 2 Notice of Removal) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011: # 3 Exhibits to Notice of Removal) (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ung et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Ung
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Andrei V. Rado
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chi Cheng
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Andrei V. Rado
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Rosen
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Sanford P. Dumain
Represented By: Andrei V. Rado
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Kim E. Richman
Represented By: Jeff S. Westerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?