Mitchell v. Grounds et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Mitchell
Defendant: Randy Grounds, D. Bright and M. Sepulveda
Case Number: 5:2011cv03012
Filed: June 22, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Defendant's motion to dismiss (Docket No. 40) isGRANTED, and Mitchell's claims against Bright are DISMISSED. Mitchell's motion for reconsideration (Docket No. 44) is DENIED as conclusory and lacking sufficient support. The Clerk shall terminate Docket Nos. 40 and 44, enter judgment in favor of all defendants as to all claims, and close the file. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/06/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 25 Motion to Compel. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, two copies of the Waiver of Service of Summons, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, a copy of the Court's Order of Service (Docket No. 9), and a copy of this order upon Defendant Dr. D. Bright at the Correctional Training Facility in Soledad (P.O. Box 686, Soledad, CA 93960-0686). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon Defendants as follows: Warden Randy Grounds, Dr. D. Bright, and Dr. M. Sepulveda at the Correctional Training Facility in Soledad (P.O. Box 686, Soledad, CA 93960-0686); and C. Hammond and D. Foston at the Inmate Appeals Branch, (CDCR, P.O. Box 942883, Sacramento, CA 94283-0001). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE re 6 Letter. The Court will construe the letter as a motion for reconsideration. Good cause appearing, the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Judgment entered on August 11, 2011, (Docket No. 4 ) is VACATED. The Court will conduct an initial screening of the complaint in a separate order. The Clerk shall reopen the file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/12/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Grounds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?