Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Lai
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Luping Lai
Case Number: 5:2011cv03313
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting 44 Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/3/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to file a joint statement if a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) is filed on or before January 18, 2013. The parties are advised that this is the final continuance of this hearing without an appearance. Personal appearance by all counsel is required at the hearing on January 25, 2013 in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***11/9/212 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/6/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 11/2/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J Davila on 10/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT ***9/7/2012 Deadlines terminated. Show Cause Response due by 9/28/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon Edward J. D avila. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to file a joint statement if a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 41(a) is filed on or before 9/28/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. All other pretrial deadlines, motions and hearing dates are TERMINATED and VACATED, including the Pretrial Conference scheduled for 6/29/2012. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Status Statement due 8/31/2012. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/22/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 STIPULATION To Modify Case Management Order. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 8/2/2012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2012. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 6/18/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Strike. The hearing scheduled for 1/13/2012 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/9/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Based on the parties' Joint Case Management Statement and proposed schedule, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 9/30/2011 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the part ies are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Joinder of any additional parties, or other amendments to the pleadings, is 12/12/201. Deadline to complete Private ADR by 4/13/2012. Fact Discovery cutoff 6/8/2012. Expert Discovery Cutoff 6/8/2 012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/24/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/27/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 9/13/2011. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/6/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luping Lai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Muse
Represented By: Vanessa Hindley Widener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?