AF Holdings LLC v. Does 1-135
Plaintiff: AF Holdings LLC
Defendant: Does 1-135
Case Number: 5:2011cv03336
Filed: July 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/27/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/15/2012 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/9/2012. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/19/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal in part, wihtout prejudice; terminating IP 24.7.48.145 and IP 98.234.187.192; terminating 18 MOTION to Quash filed by IP 98.234.187.192, and 17 MOTION to Quash filed by IP 24.7.48.145. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/4/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 8 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Expedited Discovery.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AF Holdings LLC v. Does 1-135
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-135
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF Holdings LLC
Represented By: Brett Langdon Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?