Velasquez v. City of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Victor Velasquez
Defendant: City of Santa Clara, Steven Burress, Craig Middlekauff, Stephen Lodge, Brett Moiseff and Robert Mecir
Case Number: 5:2011cv03588
Filed: July 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER TAXING COSTS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part 304 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR JUDGEMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND FOR A NEW TRIAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 286 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 288 Motion for New Trial (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED re 300 Stipulation filed by Victor Velasquez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 16, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REVISED FINAL VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 7, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 PROPOSED VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 4, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF'S VEHICLE TO BE TOWED AND TEMPORARILY STORED NEAR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT COURTHOUSE BY SAN JOSE POLICE DEPARTMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 27, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 24, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 129 , 130 , 131 , 132 , 133 , 134 , 135 , 136 , 137 , 138 , 139 , 140 , 141 , 142 , 143 , 144 , 145 , 147 , 148 , 149 , 150 , 151 , 152 , 156 , 157 , 158 , 159 , 160 , 161 , 162 , 163 , 164 , 165 , 166 , 167 , 168 , 169 , 170 , 172 and 173 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER RE: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 7, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER RE: MEET-AND-CONFER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 31, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 77 , 87 , 108 , and 114 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER INVITING RESPONSE AND SETTING SHORTENED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 7, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 58 Stipulation Seeking Continuance of Trial and Related Dates. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 48 Letter filed by City of Santa Clara, Steven Burress, Stephen Lodge, Craig Middlekauff Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/16/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE re 44 Proposed Order filed by City of Santa Clara, Steven Burress, Victor Velasquez, Stephen Lodge, Craig Middlekauff. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/30/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE COURT ORDERED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 38 Letter filed by City of Santa Clara, Steven Burress, Victor Velasquez, Stephen Lodge, Craig Middlekauff. Deadline for Early Settlement Conference continued to October 31, 2012. The August 20, 2012 at 10:00am date is vacated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/20/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/5/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER LIFTING STAY, RE-SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND SETTING PRE-SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION CONFERENCE re 25 Clerks Notice setting Case Management Conference, 21 Stipulation re Stay, filed by City of Santa Clara, Robert Mecir, Brett Moiseff, Steven Burress, Victor Velasquez, Stephen Lodge, Craig Middlekauff. Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2012 02:00 PM. Pre-Summary Judgment Motion Conference also set for 3/28/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/8/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. City of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Velasquez
Represented By: Andrew Vinson Stearns
Represented By: M. Jeffery Kallis
Represented By: Steven Michael Berki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Burress
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Middlekauff
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lodge
Represented By: Michael C. Serverian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Moiseff
Represented By: Shannon Smyth-Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mecir
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Represented By: John P. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?