Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc. v. Western Digital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation, Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited and Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD.
Case Number: 5:2011cv03786
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER GRANTING WESTERN DIGITAL'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE TRANSCRIPT ON WESTERN DIGITAL'S MOTION TO ENFORCE, granting 552 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/10/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 482 , 483 , 484 , 486 , 487 , 492 , 500 , and 514 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER CLARIFYING DOCKET NO. 498 REGARDING DOCKET NOS. 490 AND 494. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 5, 2013. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 467 , 468 , and 469 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 298 , 309 , 316 , 327 , 342 , 348 , 363 , 365 , 367 , 371 , [379-2], 385 , 389 , 392 , 406 , 407 , 421 , 425 , and 456 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER MODIFYING OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 453 modifying 448 RE: 334 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013).
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 311 , [316-4], 328 , 329 , 331 , 332 , 333 , 334 , 335 , 336 , 338 , 339 , 340 , 341], 343 , 344 , 345 , 347 , 349 , 350], 352 , 356 , [371-4], [371-6], [371-8], 373 , and [373-1] (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER RE: WESTERN DIGITAL'S MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON NONINFRINGEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 131 , 234 , and 235 ; granting-in-part 260 , 262 , and 276 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER RE: GTE'S MOTION TO STRIKE WESTERN DIGITAL'S UNTIMELY IDENTIFIED WITNESSES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 233 ; granting-in-part 227 and 257 ; and granting 274 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS SUBJECT TO WESTERN DIGITAL'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF WESTERN DIGITAL'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (D.I. 190), re 199 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/22/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION, MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 56(D) by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 132 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS SUBJECT TO WESTERN DIGITAL'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF WESTERN DIGITAL'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (D.I. 190), re 199 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/10/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 181 Motion for Leave to File; denying 185 Motion for Leave to File (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re 142 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/13/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON WESTERN DIGITAL'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM DLA PIPER LLP, granting 148 : 4/2/2013 Motion Hearing advanced to 3/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 3/1/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 76 GRANTING STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME filed by Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD., Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited, Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 5/9/2012. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS, re 62 Stipulation, filed by Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD., Western Digital Technol ogies, Inc., Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited, Western Digital Corporation. 1/24/2012 Motion Hearing (Docket 51 ) continued to 1/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/10/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 Stipulation, filed by Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD., Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited, Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/20/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, re 49 Stipulation filed by Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc. 12/13/2011 Case Management Conference continued to 12/16/2011 at 02:00 PM (Special Set) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/7/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 25 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Stipulation, filed by Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD., Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited, Western Digital Corporation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/31/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Continuing Hearing Date Re 25 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/25/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Stipulation, filed by Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/11/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Stipulation, filed by Western Digital (Fremont) Inc, Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD., Western Digital Technologies, Inc., Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited, Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc., Western Digital Corporation. Response to Complaint due by 9/26/2011. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 12, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc. v. Western Digital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guzik Technical Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jaideep Venkatesan
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Represented By: Daniel J. Bergeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Represented By: Reynaldo Carlos Barcelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Reynaldo Carlos Barcelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital (Fremont) Inc
Represented By: Reynaldo Carlos Barcelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital (Thailand) Company Limited
Represented By: Reynaldo Carlos Barcelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital (Malaysia) SDN.BHD.
Represented By: Reynaldo Carlos Barcelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?