Basich v. Patenaude and Felix, APC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Basich
Defendant: Patenaude and Felix, APC and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 5:2011cv04406
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of theobligation to file a joint statement if a stipulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41( a) is filed on or before June 21, 2013. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***6/6/2013 OSC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 5/30/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/6/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for a settlement conference to occur on 5/10/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/24/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Final Pretrial Conference from 4/19/2013 to 4/26/2013 re 219 Stipulation filed by Patenaude and Felix, APC, Mary Basich, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Updated Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 4/16/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order Granting 166 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents. Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents is GRANTED and Docket Numbers DOCKET NOS. 154 , 155 , 156 , 157 , and [158-18] are permanently deleted from the Court's docket. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING 150 STIPULATION RE JOINT 149 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This Order also terminates docket item no. 149 . Motions terminated: Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012) Modified on 9/27/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2 for a settlement conference to occur no later than 10/19/2012. The parties are instructed to contact Judge Grewals Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/10/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 108 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #11. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 106 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 8/10/2012 at 11:00 a.m. is CONVERTED to a Case Management Conference. The parties shall file a Joint Case Manag ement Statement on or before 8/3/2012 within which either party may renew the request to modify the scheduling order. A personal appearance by counsel will be necessary at the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 92 Discovery Dispute Report #6.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 INTERIM ORDER re 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's papers (no more than 2 pages) re DDJR #3 due by 5:00 PM on 6/11/2012. Defendants' response (no more than 7 pages) due by noon, 6/13/2012. Unless otherwise ordered, matter will be deemed submitted without oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/8/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 59 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #5. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 56 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND APPOINT SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTER. The court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to modify the schedule. The court does not find that the appointment of a special mas ter is necessary at this time because the matters at hand can be effectively and timely addressed by a judge of the district. Accordingly, the court DENIES Plaintiff's motion to appoint a special discovery master. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the f ollowing modified schedule shall apply to this case: Fact and Expert Discovery cutoff 7/1/2012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 8/1/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motions terminated AS MOOT: 48 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Mary Basich. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 41 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Attorney Hunter Randolph Eley terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/14/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Re: Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/05/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Re: Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/27/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert David Humphreys. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/7/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basich v. Patenaude and Felix, APC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Basich
Represented By: Balam O Letona
Represented By: Balam Osberto Letona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patenaude and Felix, APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?