Areas USA SJC, LLC v. Mission San Jose Airport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Areas USA SJC, LLC
Defendant: Mission Yogurt, Inc and Mission San Jose Airport, LLC
Case Number: 5:2011cv04487
Filed: September 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 5-1(E)(7). Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/8/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on July 8, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER continuing Order to Show Cause Hearing to 7/9/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause response is due 7/2/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on May 3, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing continued to 5/7/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 21, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on February 12, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/19/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/12/2013. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on January 3, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 FURTHER PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 28, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting partial relief from Standing Order Re: Pretrial Preparation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 11, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending parties' deadline to complete settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on December 7, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Denying 92 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendants' Expert Witnesses (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd DENYING 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING 97 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Objection to the Sur-Reply. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Denying 62 Motion for Reconsideration.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Granting in part and Denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss Mission's Second Amended Counterclaims. Signed on 8/1/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 33 34 ; (2) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 29 ; AND (3) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/18/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Plaintiff's pending motions to strike Mission's Second Amended Answer and to dismiss its First Amended Answer and to strike portions thereof are deemed suitable for determination without oral argument. The 3/13/2012 hearing is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 22 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND 23 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd ON 12/13/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 12 (As Modified by the Court). Case Management Statement due by 11/15/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/31/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Areas USA SJC, LLC v. Mission San Jose Airport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Yogurt, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission San Jose Airport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Areas USA SJC, LLC
Represented By: Scott Donald Bertzyk
Represented By: Karin Leeann Bohmholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?