Oda v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Celeste Oda
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2011cv04514
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO INCREASE THE AMOUNT OF AN ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 22 Motion to increase the amount of an administrative claim (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/17/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND JOIN A NEW PARTY DEFENDANT by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 13 Motion to Amend/Correct; (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION re 11 Proposed Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 20, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 21, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oda v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Oda
Represented By: John S. Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?