Rivera-Diaz v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Pandora Media, Inc. and The Weather Channel, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv04560
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER re (30 in 5:11-md-02250-LHK) Stipulation Re: Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/5/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 27, 2011 10 CLERKS NOTICE advising counsel of receipt of case (Rivera-Diaz -v- Apple, Inc., et al, 3:11-cv-01433) from the District of Puerto Rico (OUR CASE NO. C11-04560) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 22, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 9 Case transferred in from District of Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:11-cv-01433. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2011 8 Certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) received from the Northern District of California re: MDL 2250. The ND of California has assigned number 5:11CV4560 LHK to this action. Schedule A attached. (li)
September 8, 2011 7 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) for transfer of this action to the Northern District of California received from the US Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re: MDL 2250. CTO-1 directed to the ND of California for filing. Order becomes effective upon receipt of certified copy from the transferee court. (Attachments: # 1 CTO-1 and Schedule of Tag-A-Long Actions) (li)
July 14, 2011 6 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by Matthew D. Brown. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Record to reflect that there is a pending MDL proceeding that may affect this civil case, (MDL Docket 2250). (re)
July 14, 2011 5 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by Seth A. Gold. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Record to reflect that there is a pending MDL proceeding that may affect this civil case, (MDL Docket 2250). (re)
July 14, 2011 4 NOTICE of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument filed by Michael H. Page. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Record to reflect that there is a pending MDL proceeding that may affect this civil case, (MDL Docket 2250). (re)
May 11, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to APPLE, INC., PANDORA MEDIA, INC., THE WEATHER CHANNEL, INC. (ga)
May 11, 2011 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ga)
May 10, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0104-2415737.), filed by LYMARIS M RIVERA DIAZ. Service due by 9/12/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet, # 3 Appendix Summons Apple, Inc., # 4 Appendix Summons Pandora, # 5 Appendix Summons Weather Channel)(Quetglas-Jordan, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Diaz v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lymaris M. Rivera-Diaz
Represented By: Eric M. Quetglas-Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?