Koenig et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Joseph Koenig and Veronica Koenig
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2011cv04876
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 Compromise and Settlement. Stipulated dismissal to be filed within 5 business days of receipt by plaintiffs' attorney of the settlement amount. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/11/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Denying 49 plaintiffs' request for telephonic appearance at 7/9/2013 case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/8/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Initial case management conference set for 3/13/2012, 1:30 PM. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/24/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 5 Continuing Case Management Conference. Initial case management conference continued to 1/31/2012, 1:30 PM. All related deadlines are adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/18/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koenig et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Koenig
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Koenig
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?