Henderson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr.
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations, San Quentin State Prison, J Espinoza, D Shampain and J. K. Yu
Case Number: 5:2011cv04918
Filed: October 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/21/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 106 Stipulated Protective Order to Stay Discovery. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 88 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; Further Briefing. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER 92 Granting Notice of Substitution of Counsel Defendant David Shampain, D.D.S. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 54 Motion to Dismiss; Terminating 64 Stipulated Protective Order. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Default Against Dr. Shampain by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Denying 65 Motion for Default Judgment; Granting 67 Motion for Entry of Default. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Motion for Reconsideration of Preliminary Injunction; Denying in Part and Granting in Part Plaintiff's motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER 42 Granting Defendant Espinoza's Motion to Change Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendnat Espinoza's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/24/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Directing Clerk to Re-Issue Summons o Dr. D. Shampain by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Directing Clerk to Re-Issue Summons on Dr. J.K. Yu; Directing Plaintiff to Provide Court with More Information for Dr. D. Shampain. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/30/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Order of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion; Addressing Pending Motions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lee Henderson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Shampain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K. Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?