Samaro v. Swarthout
Petitioner: Alex R. Samaro
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Case Number: 5:2011cv05010
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUIRING ELECTION BY PETITIONER 3 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. I, the undersigned Judge of the court, finding myself disqualified from presiding over the above-entitled action, hereby recuse myself from this case and request that it be reassigned pursuant to the applicable provisions of this District's Assignment Plan. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order and the petition and all attachments thereto on Respondent and Respondent's attorney, the Attorney General of the State of California. The Clerk also shall serve a copy of this order on Petitioner Habeas Answer due by 7/20/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samaro v. Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex R. Samaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?