OpenDNS, Inc. v. Paxfire, Inc.
Plaintiff: OpenDNS, Inc.
Defendant: Paxfire, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05101
Filed: October 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE: 116 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER. Defendant shall file its written opposition to Plaintiff's Motion, if any, on or before 7/5/2013. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 93 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No #1 and 94 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying Plaintiff's 56 Motion to Strike and granting Defendant's 63 Motion for Leave to File Amended Infringement Contentions. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 13, 2013.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 12, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to Section I(A) of the undersigned's Standing Order for Patent Cases, any disputes regarding any party's Patent Disclosures are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, Pl aintiff's Motion to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions 53 must be re-noticed before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The deadlines and hearing scheduled before District Judge Edward J. Davila are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/12/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by OpenDNS, Inc. Halsey Minor terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Paxfire, Inc.. Attorney Brent David Rafferty, Steven R. Daniels for Paxfire, Inc. added. Attorney Melinda Mae Morton and Jaideep Venkatesan terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OpenDNS, Inc. v. Paxfire, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OpenDNS, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edward Krebs
Represented By: Jennifer Hayes
Represented By: Ronald Frank Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxfire, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?