Meneses v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dante Meneses
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc. and CR Title Services Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05227
Filed: October 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 6 Motion to Strike; denying 10 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Based on the Case Management Statement filed by Defendants (see Docket Item No. 26), the court finds that a Case Management Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the 3/30/2012 Case Management Conference is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) CONTINUING MOTION HEARING RE 5 6 10 ; (2) REMINDER RE: CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE; (3) CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 6 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint, 10 MOTION to expunge notice of pendency of action (lis pendens) and award of attorneys' fees and costs MOTION to expunge notice of pendency of action (lis pendens) and awar d of attorneys' fees and costs. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd.. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/29/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meneses v. CitiMortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Meneses
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Represented By: Alice Marie Dostalova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Title Services Inc.
Represented By: Alice Marie Dostalova
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?