Kremen v. Cohen et al
Plaintiff: Gary Kremen
Defendant: Michael Joseph Cohen and FNBPAY Corporation
Case Number: 5:2011cv05411
Filed: November 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 169 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/27/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 160 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 59 Motion to Quash; denying 59 Motion for Referral to the Court's Standing Committee of Professional Conduct and Motion Requiring Plaintiff to Post a Five Million Dollar Bond; denying 64 Motion for Notification of Fraud Upon the Court. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 93 Motion to Intervene. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Denying 115 Motion to Quash; Denying 116 Motion to Quash; Denying 117 Motion to Quash; Denying 118 Motion to Quash; Denying 119 Motion to Quash; Denying 120 Motion to Quash; Denying 121 Motion to Quash; Denying 122 Motio n to Quash; Denying 123 Motion to Quash; Denying 124 Motion to Quash; Denying 125 Motion to Quash; Denying 126 Motion to Quash. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2012.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER (1) TERMINATING 90 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; AND (2) DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH THIS COURT'S STANDING ORDER RE CIVIL DISCOVERY DISPUTES.Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/30/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 79 Denying Motion to Continue the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/19/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 74 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 31 Motion to Transfer Case; denying as moot 34 and 47 Motion to Shorten Time; denying as moot 52 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Cancel TRO; denying without prejudice 23 Ex Parte Application for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Extending TRO; Continuing Order to Show Cause Hearing; and Striking 14 17 20 25 26 27 28 Filed by Non-Party Stephen Michael Cohen. Order to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/5/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/15/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 15 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 5 Ex Parte Application for TRO; Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue; Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Conduct Expedited Discovery. Page 16 of Docke t No. 15 erroneously lists the hearing date as Thursday, December 16, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. Defendants are ordered to show cause at a hearing on Friday, December 16, 2011, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/7/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/2/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kremen v. Cohen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Kremen
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Joseph Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNBPAY Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?