A10 Networks Inc v. Brocade Communications Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: A10 Networks Inc
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv05493
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Judgment Dismissing Action in Favor of Defendant and Against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/27/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Redacted Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 63 Motion to Dismiss. Unredacted Order to be filed under seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/25/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 76 Stipulation.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER Permitting A10 Networks, Inc. to File a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/4/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/19/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re: Discovery. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/14/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A10 Networks Inc v. Brocade Communications Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems Inc
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Represented By: Denise Marie Mingrone
Represented By: Siddhartha M. Venkatesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A10 Networks Inc
Represented By: Mark A. Flagel
Represented By: Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey
Represented By: Ryan Ephraim Hatch
Represented By: Jessica Kronstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?