Gens-v-Colonial Savings, F.A.
Defendant: Colonial Savings, F.A., Associated Bank, National Association and Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2011cv05526
Filed: November 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion for Attorney Fees (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte finding as moot 130 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 130 Motion to Dismiss; granting 132 Motion for Joinder; denying 140 Motion for Sanctions; granting 154 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER compelling document production and depositions. Timothy Gens deposition set for July 30, 2014; Laura Gens deposition set for July 31, 2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 7/11/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 MOTION to Dismiss and 101 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 3/27/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER 120 to Modify Scheduling Order: Jury Trial set for 9/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before H on. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Fact Discovery cutoff 5/30/2014. Expert Discovery cutoff 6/30/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 102 Motion to Dismiss of Associated Bank and continuing 100 Motion to Dismiss of Colonial and 101 Motion to Dismiss of MERS (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte denying 96 Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JOINT STIPULATED MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER 95 . Jury Trial set for 4/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Discovery cutoff 12/31/2013. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/19/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 76 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 79 Motion for Leave to File and Amended Complaint. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 50 Ex Parte Application to Extend Time. The amended complaint must be filed by May 9, 2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 33 Motion to Compel and denying sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 17 18 19 Motions to Dismiss and for More Definite Statement. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 12 Request to use ECF. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/17/2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 1 , 4 GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/23/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gens-v-Colonial Savings, F.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Savings, F.A.
Represented By: Ryan Mark Davies
Represented By: Daniel Kei Fujimoto
Represented By: Alan Steven Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Bank, National Association
Represented By: John Tokuyama Meno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Service, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Mark Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?